This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/01/2023 at 02:54:11 (UTC).

BERENICE DE LA VEGA VS. PEDRO GARCIA MIAMI DADE COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 BERENICE DE LA VEGA filed an Other lawsuit against PEDRO GARCIA MIAMI DADE COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE LA VEGA, BERENICE

Defendants

PEDRO GARCIA MIAMI DADE COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

JIM ZINBALE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

GERARDO GOMEZ MIAMI DADE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Mastrucci, Michael J (Asst. County Atty)

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/26/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/26/2021 - Complaint

Affidavit of Indigency

01/26/2021 - Affidavit of Indigency

Certificate of Indigency / Insolvency

01/26/2021 - Certificate of Indigency / Insolvency

Service Returned

02/09/2021 - Service Returned

Motion for Extension of Time

02/24/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Answer to Amended Complaint

03/26/2021 - Answer to Amended Complaint

Motion for Extension of Time

06/29/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion:

06/29/2021 - Motion:

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

12/03/2021 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Unavailability/absence

07/07/2022 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Order Setting Case Management Conference

08/18/2022 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

Motion:

09/13/2022 - Motion:

Notice of Hearing-

09/16/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion:

09/21/2022 - Motion:

Order of Transfer (Change of Venue)

11/17/2022 - Order of Transfer (Change of Venue)

Order of Referral to Mediation Unit

02/03/2023 - Order of Referral to Mediation Unit

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Referral to Mediation Unit; Event Type: Event; Comments: 04-25-23@3:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Transfer (Change of Venue); Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Transfer (Change of Venue); Book/Page: 33626:4294; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 8:00AM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BASED ON LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 11/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 6:00AM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BASED ON LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: CMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Indigency / Insolvency; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Indigency; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PEDRO GARCIA MIAMI DADE COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: JIM ZINBALE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GERARDO GOMEZ MIAMI DADE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less