This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/07/2022 at 05:02:51 (UTC).

BAYVIEW MEDICAL & REHAB CENTER INC VS STEADFAST INS CO

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 BAYVIEW MEDICAL REHAB CENTER INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEADFAST INS CO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bayview Medical & Rehab Center Inc

Assignor

Rodgers, Ebony

Defendant

Steadfast Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dover, Jeremy Phillip

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/14/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

06/14/2022 - Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

06/14/2022 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

06/14/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

06/14/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

06/14/2022 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

06/14/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

06/14/2022 - Email Notice:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/16/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/17/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120030AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:DOVER, JEREMY PHILLIP3920 W. BROWARD BLVDSUITE B-1FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33312COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/18/2022REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: Steadfast Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140519AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:DOVER, JEREMY PHILLIP3920 W. BROWARD BLVDSUITE B-1FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33312COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:06/15/2022REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PIP-PLEADINGS@ATTORNEYSOFTHEINJURED.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Steadfast Insurance Company aso H & M Hennes & Ma is a litigant

Latest cases where Bayview Medical & Rehab Center Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dover, Jeremy Phillip