This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 12/12/2019 at 00:38:36 (UTC).

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC VS ALICE J BENNETT ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALICE J BENNETT. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

HAMPSHIRE HOMES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

BENNETT, ALICE J

BENNETT, MICHAEL H

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vandergriff, Lea W.

Defendant Attorney

Iglesias, David D

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned - No Service

07/31/2019 - Summons Returned - No Service

Answer and Affirmative Defense

07/22/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Service Return for Unknown Party

07/11/2019 - Service Return for Unknown Party

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/26/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/26/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/26/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/26/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/26/2019 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

06/21/2019 - Lis Pendens

Summons Returned - No Service

07/31/2019 - Summons Returned - No Service

Notice of Appearance

07/22/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Service Returned

07/17/2019 - Service Returned

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/26/2019 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/26/2019 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/26/2019 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/26/2019 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Memorandum

06/21/2019 - Memorandum

Civil Cover

06/21/2019 - Civil Cover

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketService Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketService Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31547:3898; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BENNETT ALICE J; BENNETT MICHAEL H; HAMPSHIRE HOMES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONINC; STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: HAMPSHIRE HOMES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONINC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: HAMPSHIRE HOMES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONINC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketService Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3520061AMT PAID:$920.00 NAME:VANDERGRIFF, LEA W. 8201 PETERS RD STE 3000 PLANTATION FL 33324-3292 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.00 3102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$5.00$5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens; Book/Page: 31497:3859; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF PREVIOUS FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bayview Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vandergriff, Lea W.