This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/30/2020 at 07:12:39 (UTC).

BARRY W. LEVITT, D.C., P.A. VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 BARRY W LEVITT, D C , P A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARRY W. LEVITT, D.C., P.A.

Assignor

Lexania Matos Fonseca

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Berger, Martin I

Defendant Attorney

Griggs, Erinn Mia

 

Court Documents

Motion for Relief from Judgment

05/20/2020 - Motion for Relief from Judgment

Response to Request for Admissions

05/20/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Production

05/20/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Privilege Log

05/20/2020 - Privilege Log

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

05/20/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Admissions

03/30/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Answer and Affirmative Defense

03/18/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

03/06/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Admissions

03/06/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

03/06/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

03/06/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Pre Trial Summons

02/19/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

02/13/2020 - Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

02/13/2020 - Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

02/13/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

02/13/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

02/13/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Relief from Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-7 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3220006AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/20/2020 REGISTER#:322CASHIER:DAVERNF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440062AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:BERGER, MARTIN I 9700 S DIXIE HWY STE 850 MIAMI FL 33156-2800 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2,535.58

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 8,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.