This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/22/2020 at 13:28:01 (UTC).

BARBERY, BRIGITTE VS RUIZ-RAMIREZ, ROBERTO

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 BARBERY, BRIGITTE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RUIZ-RAMIREZ, ROBERTO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Barbery, Brigitte

Respondent

Ruiz-Ramirez, Roberto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Perez, P. Alejandro

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Proof of Publication - Notice of Action; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Action - Publication; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ruiz-Ramirez Roberto

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Diligent Search; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RETURN OF NON SERVICE ON RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Directing Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ruiz-Ramirez Roberto

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3520062AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:PEREZ, P. ALEJANDRO 123 NW 1ST AVE MIAMI FL 33128 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Application/ Aff for Determination of Civil Indigent Status; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) ESummons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510032AMT PAID:$409.00 NAME:PEREZ, P. ALEJANDRO 123 NW 1ST AVE MIAMI FL 33128 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$409.00 RECEIPT DAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Application for Determination of Indigent Status Approved; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Application/ Aff for Determination of Civil Indigent Status; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Financial Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.