This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/27/2019 at 03:38:20 (UTC).

BAPTISTE, GERONIMA VS CHARLES, CHENET, JR.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 BAPTISTE, GERONIMA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHARLES, CHENET, JR. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BAPTISTE, GERONIMA

Respondents

CHARLES, CHENET

Charles, Chenet, Jr

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: NO SUMMONS AND ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Affidavit of; Event Type: Event; Comments: SHERIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Return of Service Served; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Charles Chenet Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • Return of Service on Order Served; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • Motion for Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO JUDGE (NO SUMMONS AND ANSWER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Response; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Charles Chenet Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Acknowledgment of Status Quo Temp Domestic Relations Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Acknowledgement of Receipt; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Index of Forms; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Application for Determination of Indigent Status Approved; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2670009AMT PAID:$419.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$419.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/10/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Filed at South Dade; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Affidavit of Indigency; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Certificate of Indigency / Insolvency; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.