This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/16/2022 at 06:14:53 (UTC).

BANK OF THE WEST VS J.C. SUVILLAGA BRICKS AND PAVERS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 BANK OF THE WEST filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against J C SUVILLAGA BRICKS AND PAVERS INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of the West

Defendants

J.C. SUVILLAGA BRICKS AND PAVERS INC

Perez, Jorge Freddy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason A Rosenthal

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/20/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/20/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/21/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/21/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/25/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/25/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

02/07/2022 - Service Returned

Settlement Agreement

04/11/2022 - Settlement Agreement

Order of Dismissal

04/14/2022 - Order of Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33132:3194; Event Type: Event; Comments: AGREEDAND RESERVING JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT STIPULATION (FINAL JUDGMENT UPON DEFAULT) Parties: J.C. SUVILLAGA BRICKS AND PAVERS INC; Perez Jorge Freddy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Settlement Agreement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Perez Jorge Freddy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: J.C. SUVILLAGA BRICKS AND PAVERS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2980057AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:JASON A ROSENTHAL976 LAKE BALDWIN LN STE 103ORLANDO FL 32814-6687COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:01/25/2022REGISTER#:298CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2940054AMT PAID:$486.00NAME:JASON A ROSENTHAL976 LAKE BALDWIN LN STE 103ORLANDO FL 32814-6687COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003134-WRIT (GARD) ADD FE1$85.00$85.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$486.00RECEIPT DATE:01/22/2022REGISTER#:294CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BANK OF THE WEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON A ROSENTHAL