This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/26/2023 at 16:29:31 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY VS EUGENIO F PINALES ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against EUGENIO F PINALES. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company

Mortgage Assets Management Series I Trust

Defendants

Pinales, Eugenio F

United States Of America Department Of Housing And

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ullman, Zachary Y, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Service Return for Unknown Party

03/24/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

03/24/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Returned

03/24/2023 - Service Returned

Service Return for Unknown Party

03/24/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Notice of Appearance

03/07/2023 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/28/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/28/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/28/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/28/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/28/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

02/23/2023 - Lis Pendens

Email Notice:

02/22/2023 - Email Notice:

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EUGENIO F. PINELAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13. Parties: Pinales Eugenio F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12. Parties: Pinales Eugenio F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180187AMT PAID:$1,911.00NAME:ULLMAN, ZACHARY Y, ESQ5300 ATLANTIC AVE, SUITE 303DELRAY BEACH FL 33484-8141COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$1,906.00$1,906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$1,911.00RECEIPT DATE:02/24/2023REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33593:4999; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SERVICEMAIL@ALDRIDGEPITE.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less