This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/02/2022 at 18:04:51 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY NA VS GUY CHARLES ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GUY CHARLES. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY NA

Defendants

CHARLES, GUY

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meisels, Jonathan Ian

 

Court Documents

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/19/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/19/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

01/19/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/19/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

01/19/2022 - Lis Pendens

Notice:

01/19/2022 - Notice:

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

01/19/2022 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/19/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/19/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Motion:

03/22/2022 - Motion:

Non-Military Affidavit

02/17/2022 - Non-Military Affidavit

Service Returned

01/31/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

01/31/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

01/31/2022 - Service Returned

Summons Returned - No Service

01/31/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/24/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/24/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/24/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO STOP FORCLOSURE. DEFENDANT PATRICK GUY CHARLES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11. Parties: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32978:2256; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PREVIOUS FILINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan