This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/22/2022 at 11:44:06 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY NA AS TR VS ROSA GARMENDIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY NA AS TR filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ROSA GARMENDIA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY NA AS TR

Defendants

GARMENDIA, ROSA

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

DOME CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

GARMENDIA, ROSA N

REYES (ESTATE OF) (DECEASED), ROSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meisels, Jonathan Ian

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/14/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

06/14/2022 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Certificate of Possession of Note

06/14/2022 - Certificate of Possession of Note

Complaint

06/14/2022 - Complaint

Lis Pendens

06/15/2022 - Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

06/15/2022 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/15/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/15/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/15/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/15/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/15/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12. Parties: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: GARMENDIA ROSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: DOME CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090033AMT PAID:$50.00NAME:MEISELS, JONATHAN IANROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ, SCHNEID, CRANE & PARTNERS, PLBOCA RATON FL 33487-2853COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$50.00RECEIPT DATE:06/17/2022REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020103AMT PAID:$915.00NAME:MEISELS, JONATHAN IANROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ, SCHNEID, CRANE & PARTNERS, PLBOCA RATON FL 33487-2853COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$915.00RECEIPT DATE:06/16/2022REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33244:471; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dome Condominium Association Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan