This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/25/2021 at 09:55:35 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST CO, N.A. AS TR VS UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST CO, N A AS TR filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST CO, N.A. AS TR

Defendants

ESTATE OF CARIDAD TAPIA (DECEASED)

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meisels, Jonathan Ian

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Possession of Note

10/08/2021 - Certificate of Possession of Note

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/08/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

10/08/2021 - Complaint

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

10/08/2021 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Notice:

10/08/2021 - Notice:

Lis Pendens

10/08/2021 - Lis Pendens

Service Return for Unknown Party

11/19/2021 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Answer and Affirmative Defense

11/17/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Service Returned

11/10/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

11/10/2021 - Service Returned

Answer

11/01/2021 - Answer

Lis Pendens

10/08/2021 - Lis Pendens

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/14/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/14/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/14/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/13/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

10/13/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/13/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY ETC. (SUMMONS ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, ETC. (SUMMONS ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11. Parties: FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2980200AMT PAID:$1,915.00NAME:MEISELS, JONATHAN IANROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ, SCHNEID, CRANE & PARTNERS, PLBOCA RATON FL 33487-2853COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$1,906.00$1,906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$1,915.00RECEIPT DATE:10/09/2021REGISTER#:298CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32788:4044; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF PREVIOUS FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Housing Finance Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan