This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/01/2022 at 01:03:33 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON (THE) VS KEITH COLEBROOKE (ESTATE OF)

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON THE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KEITH COLEBROOKE ESTATE OF. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON (THE)

BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE (THE)

Defendants

COLEBROOKE (ESTATE OF), KEITH

COLEBROOKE (DECEASED), KEITH ANDERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roy A Diaz

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/18/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

05/18/2022 - Complaint

Appraisal of Real Property

05/18/2022 - Appraisal of Real Property

Lis Pendens

05/20/2022 - Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

05/20/2022 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/20/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/20/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Summons Returned - No Service

06/13/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

06/13/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Order of Dismissal

06/29/2022 - Order of Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

06/29/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

Final Disposition Document

06/29/2022 - Final Disposition Document

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33267:1412; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: COLEBROOKE (ESTATE OF) KEITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33267:1076; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: COLEBROOKE (ESTATE OF) KEITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080138AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:ROY A DIAZDIAZ ANSELMO LINDBERG P.A. 499 NW 70TH AVE SUITE 3FORT LAUDERDALE, FL 33317-7574COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:05/27/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070059AMT PAID:$915.00NAME:ROY A DIAZDIAZ ANSELMO LINDBERG P.A. 499 NW 70TH AVE SUITE 3FORT LAUDERDALE, FL 33317-7574COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$915.00RECEIPT DATE:05/21/2022REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33203:252; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Appraisal of Real Property; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diaz, Roy Alan