This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/30/2022 at 17:36:15 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON (THE) VS CATALINA WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON THE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CATALINA WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON (THE)

THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE

Defendants

CATALINA WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

HAMATY, EDWARD SCOTT

LAKES BY THE BAY ESTATE HOMES ASSOCIATION INC

OLD CUTLER LAKES BY THE BAY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

HAMATY, SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roy A Diaz

 

Court Documents

Order:

11/18/2022 - Order:

Motion:

11/16/2022 - Motion:

Order Setting CM Deadline

11/15/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Service Return for Unknown Party

10/19/2022 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

10/19/2022 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Returned

10/19/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

10/19/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

10/19/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

10/19/2022 - Service Returned

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/15/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/15/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/15/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/15/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/15/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

06/07/2022 - Lis Pendens

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

06/03/2022 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Complaint

06/03/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/03/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: (AGREED) EXCUSING DEFENDANT FROM COMPLYING WITH SCHEDULING ORDER, UNIFORM ORDER SETTING CAUSE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL AND ATTENDANCE AT TRIAL IS GRANTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO BE EXCUSED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event; Comments: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (STREAMLINED PATHWAY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190130AMT PAID:$917.50NAME:ROY A DIAZDIAZ ANSELMO LINDBERG P.A. 499 NW 70TH AVE SUITE 3FORT LAUDERDALE, FL 33317-7574COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$2.50$2.503142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$917.50RECEIPT DATE:06/08/2022REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33226:1841; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less