This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/12/2022 at 06:02:14 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE (THE) VS TERESA ROJAS ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE THE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against TERESA ROJAS. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE (THE)

Defendants

ROJAS, TERESA

LOPEZ, RICARDO

STATE FARM BANK

MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

WOODGATE ASSOCIATION INC

FIRST SELECT CORPORATION

CLERK OF COURT MIAMI-DADE COUNTY FLORIDA

CACH LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Delaney, Suzanne Victoria

Defendant Attorney

Rehr, Michael Eliot

 

Court Documents

Order Setting CM Deadline

07/25/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Motion for Leave

05/12/2022 - Motion for Leave

Non-Military Affidavit

05/06/2022 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default

05/06/2022 - Motion for Default

Summons Returned - No Service

04/18/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

04/18/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

04/18/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Returned

04/18/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

04/18/2022 - Service Returned

Lis Pendens

03/22/2022 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/22/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/22/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

03/22/2022 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Email Notice:

03/22/2022 - Email Notice:

Complaint

03/22/2022 - Complaint

Certificate of Possession of Note

03/22/2022 - Certificate of Possession of Note

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/22/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/22/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Leave; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Change UCR Non Jury Characteristic; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33088:3448; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SDELANEY@STOREYLAWGROUP.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Woodgate Association, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Main Street Acquisition Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where First Select, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Bank is a litigant