This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/03/2022 at 23:39:51 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS WILLIAM NATHAN ROGERS

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILLIAM NATHAN ROGERS. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of America NA

Defendant

ROGERS, WILLIAM NATHAN

Garnishee

SAZERAC COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pardo, Monique K

 

Court Documents

Non-Military Affidavit

10/29/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

07/11/2019 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Motion for Default

10/29/2019 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

07/11/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/15/2019 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Service Returned

07/20/2019 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/16/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice:

04/28/2022 - Notice:

Copy of:

04/25/2022 - Copy of:

Notice:

04/22/2022 - Notice:

Notice:

04/01/2022 - Notice:

Writ of Garnishment Returned Executed

03/31/2022 - Writ of Garnishment Returned Executed

Notice:

03/31/2022 - Notice:

Continuing Writ of Garnishment Issued

03/17/2022 - Continuing Writ of Garnishment Issued

Mot for Conti Writ of Garnish

02/25/2022 - Mot for Conti Writ of Garnish

Default Final Judgment

04/13/2021 - Default Final Judgment

Default Final Judgment

04/13/2021 - Default Final Judgment

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

03/11/2020 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO F.S. 77.055 (AMENDED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Copy of:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE (SAZERAC COMPANY INC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: THAT A CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WAS SERVED ON GARNISHEE ON 03/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT OF RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT OF WAGES, MONEY AND OTHER PROPERTY, AND A SAMPLE CLAIM OF EXEMPTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Garnishment Returned Executed; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PURSUANT TO F.S. 77.041 AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: No Further Judicial Action; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Continuing Writ of Garnishment Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Continuing Writ of Garnishment Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: MAILED TO ABC LEGAL Parties: SAZERAC COMPANY INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Text; Event Type: Event; Comments: CONTIUNING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SENT TO JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3630076AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:PARDO, MONIQUE K815 NW 57TH AVENUESTE.401MIAMI FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:07/17/2019REGISTER#:363CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ROGERS WILLIAM NATHAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2140121AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:PARDO, MONIQUE K815 NW 57TH AVENUESTE.401MIAMI FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:07/15/2019REGISTER#:214CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAZERAC COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARDO , MONIQUE K