This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/15/2021 at 05:01:23 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS IRMA OFELIA BAEZ DIAZ

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against IRMA OFELIA BAEZ DIAZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America NA

Defendant

Diaz, Irma Ofelia Baez

Miami, FL 33155

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fleischer, Rebeca

 

Court Documents

Pre Trial Summons

09/17/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

09/07/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/07/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: Coral Gables Courtroom 01-1 3100 Ponce de Leon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2210060AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/17/2021 REGISTER#:221CASHIER:MPAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Diaz Irma Ofelia Baez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030213AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:FLEISCHER, REBECA PO BOX 9908 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33310-0908 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/08/2021 REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 3056.37

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REBECA FLEISCHER