This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/26/2020 at 03:17:59 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS GABRIEL DUGAND

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against GABRIEL DUGAND. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

DUGAND, GABRIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pardo, Monique K

 

Court Documents

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

02/13/2020 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Non-Military Affidavit

02/13/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-5 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020027AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/25/2020 REGISTER#:302CASHIER:DAVERNF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: DUGAND GABRIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440056AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:PARDO, MONIQUE K 815 NW 57TH AVENUESTE.401 MIAMI FL 33126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 8,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.