This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 03/17/2020 at 04:47:22 (UTC).

BANCO PROMERICA S.A. VS ADOLFO SALUME ARTINANO

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 BANCO PROMERICA S A filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against ADOLFO SALUME ARTINANO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Banco Promerica S.A.

Defendant

Salume Artinano, Adolfo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jamie Zysk Isani (esq)

Membiela, Gustavo

Defendant Attorney

Castellanos Alvarado, Maria

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover

10/21/2019 - Civil Cover

Notice of Hearing-

01/30/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion for Extension of Time

01/30/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/18/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Complaint

10/21/2019 - Complaint

Notice of Appearance

10/23/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

02/04/2020 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Order Extending Time for

02/03/2020 - Order Extending Time for

Notice of Appearance

10/23/2019 - Notice of Appearance

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/14/2019 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO SERVE DEFENDANT/GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Jamie Zysk Isani (esq); Banco Promerica S.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Docket20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Salume Artinano Adolfo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480170AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:CASTELLANOS ALVARADO, MARIA HUNTON & WILLIAMS, SUITE 2500 MIAMI FL 33131 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3540333AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:MEMBIELA, GUSTAVO 1111 BRICKELL AVE STE 2500 MIAMI FL 33131-3126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Jamie Zysk Isani (esq); Banco Promerica S.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less