This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/02/2020 at 06:55:08 (UTC).

BADO, GONZALO JOSEPH VS BADO, MERLYN

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 BADO, GONZALO JOSEPH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BADO, MERLYN. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BADO, GONZALO JOSEPH

Respondent

BADO, MERLYN

Minor

Bado, Isabella

 

Court Documents

EFinal Judgment by Judge

04/07/2020 - EFinal Judgment by Judge

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: CHC Courtroom 28-C 175 N.W. 1st Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: EFinal Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 31893:2843; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: UNCONTESTED FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg for Respondent; Event Type: Event; Comments: DATED FOR04-07-20209:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: 04-07-2020 AT 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Text; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Text; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing Child Support Guidelines Worksheet Attached; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Bado Gonzalo Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Marital Settlement Agreement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Financial Affidavit; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Bado Gonzalo Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Waiver; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Bado Merlyn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Index of Forms; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2400009AMT PAID:$409.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$409.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/14/2020 REGISTER#:240CASHIER:CARABEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at South Dade; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less