This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/18/2021 at 18:02:09 (UTC).

B & Z ASSET MANAGEMENT CORP VS OLD REPUBLIC TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 B Z ASSET MANAGEMENT CORP filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against OLD REPUBLIC TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

B & Z Asset Management Corp

Home Equity Mortgage Corporation

Defendants

Attorneys Title Insurance Fund Inc

Old Republic Title Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cooper, Jude C

Defendant Attorney

Atkins, Leonard, IV

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unavailability/absence

05/19/2021 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

03/22/2021 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

03/22/2021 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Notice of Hearing-

03/17/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

03/16/2021 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Notice of Hearing-

02/24/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

02/24/2021 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Response to Motion

02/17/2021 - Response to Motion

Notice of Hearing-

01/29/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Request for Hearing

01/27/2021 - Request for Hearing

Notice of Hearing-

01/04/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

12/30/2020 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

11/19/2020 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Motion to Dismiss

11/13/2020 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Appearance

10/07/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

10/07/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Service Returned

09/22/2020 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/14/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event; Comments: JUNE 21, 2021 TO JUNE 25, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON 04-14-2021 AT 9:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 03-17-2021 AT 2:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2650133AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:COOPER, JUDE CBECKER & POLIAKOFF, P.A. ONE EAST BROWARD BLVD, STFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33301COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:08/25/2020REGISTER#:265CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Old Republic Title Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2640193AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:COOPER, JUDE CBECKER & POLIAKOFF, P.A. ONE EAST BROWARD BLVD, STFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33301COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:08/11/2020REGISTER#:264CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2640021AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:COOPER, JUDE CBECKER & POLIAKOFF, P.A. ONE EAST BROWARD BLVD, STFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33301COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:08/11/2020REGISTER#:264CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: JCOOPER@BECKERLAWYERS.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where B & Z Asset Management Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Home Equity Mortgage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Attorneys Title Ins Fund Inc is a litigant