This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/05/2023 at 08:40:06 (UTC).

A&Y REHABILITATION MEDICAL CENTER, INC. VS GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 A Y REHABILITATION MEDICAL CENTER, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A&Y Rehabilitation Medical Center, Inc.

Assignor

Garcia, Leo

Defendant

Geico Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patino, Richard

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/03/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/03/2023 - Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

01/03/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

01/03/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

01/03/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice:

01/03/2023 - Notice:

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/09/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/13/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Amended Statement of Claim

01/13/2023 - Amended Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060042AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/25/2023REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120058AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:01/07/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less