*************P-21
01/24/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Miami-Dade, Florida
A&Y Rehabilitation Medical Center, Inc.
Orozco, Ricardo
Auto Club Insurance Company of Florida
Patino, Richard
05/30/2023 - Motion to Dismiss
05/30/2023 - Motion to Dismiss
05/30/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions
05/30/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory
05/30/2023 - Request for Production
05/30/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense
05/23/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time
05/23/2023 - Notice of Appearance
05/10/2023 - Motion for Attorneys Fees
03/10/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory
02/21/2023 - Amended Statement of Claim
02/16/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued
02/10/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
02/06/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements
01/24/2023 - Notice:
01/24/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory
01/24/2023 - Request for Production
01/24/2023 - Request for Admissions
DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Motion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090088AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/14/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110103AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:02/01/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $7,500.00
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event; Comments: $1
[-] Read Less