This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/21/2023 at 19:23:55 (UTC).

A&Y REHABILITATION MEDICAL CENTER, INC. VS AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 A Y REHABILITATION MEDICAL CENTER, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A&Y Rehabilitation Medical Center, Inc.

Assignor

Orozco, Ricardo

Defendant

Auto Club Insurance Company of Florida

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patino, Richard

Defendant Attorneys

Itayim, Sam H.

Becker, Ryan A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing-

08/02/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Request for Production

05/30/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

03/10/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/10/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Request for Production

01/24/2023 - Request for Production

Statement of Claim

01/24/2023 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

05/30/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Amended Statement of Claim

02/21/2023 - Amended Statement of Claim

Notice:

01/24/2023 - Notice:

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT I OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEFDEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS II AND III, OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Auto Club Insurance Company of Florida

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090088AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/14/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110103AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:02/01/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $7,500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event; Comments: $1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less