This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/20/2022 at 05:27:03 (UTC).

AUTOVEST FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC VS MIKE CLAUVENS CADET

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 AUTOVEST FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MIKE CLAUVENS CADET. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Autovest Financial Services, Llc

Defendant

Cadet, Mike Clauvens

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Spinozza, Kevin

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/07/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

06/07/2022 - Statement of Claim

Email Notice:

06/07/2022 - Email Notice:

Pre Trial Summons

06/23/2022 - Pre Trial Summons

Summons Returned - No Service

07/13/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: Coral Gables Courtroom 01-1 3100 Ponce de Leon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2430129AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/23/2022REGISTER#:243CASHIER:BRYON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cadet Mike Clauvens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3240085AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:SPINOZZA, KEVIN806 S DOUGLAS RD STE 200CORAL GABLES FL 33134-3157COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:06/08/2022REGISTER#:324CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 6864.34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Autovest Financial Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin