*************P-25
12/29/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Debt Collection
Miami-Dade, Florida
Autovest Financial Services, Llc
Pastrana, Jany
Eduardo Pastrana
Spinozza, Kevin
Kardatzke, Erik, ESQ
12/29/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
12/29/2022 - Statement of Claim
12/29/2022 - Email Notice:
01/19/2023 - Pre Trial Summons
01/19/2023 - Pre Trial Summons
02/06/2023 - Notice of Appearance
02/06/2023 - Service Returned
02/06/2023 - Service Returned
02/08/2023 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial
02/09/2023 - Memorandum of Disposition
HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: Coral Gables Courtroom 01-1 3100 Ponce de Leon
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Eduardo Pastrana
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Pastrana Jany
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2500087AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/20/2023REGISTER#:250CASHIER:ASHDC
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2500003AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/20/2023REGISTER#:250CASHIER:ASHDC
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Eduardo Pastrana
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Pastrana Jany
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050310AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:SPINOZZA, KEVIN806 S DOUGLAS RD STE 200CORAL GABLES FL 33134-3157COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:12/30/2022REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2500.01
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event
[-] Read Less