This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/11/2023 at 15:04:48 (UTC).

AUTOVEST FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC VS ALBERTO MARIN SOTO ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 AUTOVEST FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALBERTO MARIN SOTO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Autovest Financial Services, Llc

Defendants

Marin Soto, Alberto

Alberto Marin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Spinozza, Kevin

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/29/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

12/29/2022 - Statement of Claim

Email Notice:

12/29/2022 - Email Notice:

Pre Trial Summons

01/19/2023 - Pre Trial Summons

Pre Trial Summons

01/19/2023 - Pre Trial Summons

Summons Returned - No Service

02/08/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

02/08/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Memorandum of Disposition

02/09/2023 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order Extending Time for

02/11/2023 - Order Extending Time for

Notice:

02/28/2023 - Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: Coral Gables Courtroom 01-1 3100 Ponce de Leon

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2500006AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/20/2023REGISTER#:250CASHIER:ASHDC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2500001AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/20/2023REGISTER#:250CASHIER:ASHDC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Alberto Marin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Marin Soto Alberto

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050309AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:SPINOZZA, KEVIN806 S DOUGLAS RD STE 200CORAL GABLES FL 33134-3157COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:12/30/2022REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2500.01

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less