This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/21/2020 at 00:05:37 (UTC).

AUTO WORK INJURY REHAB INC VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 AUTO WORK INJURY REHAB INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Auto Work Injury Rehab Inc

Assignor

Guerline, Louissaint

Defendant

Progressive American Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ross, Brion M.

Defendant Attorney

Brock, Rebecca L, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Motion for Leave

05/05/2020 - Motion for Leave

Motion:

05/05/2020 - Motion:

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

05/05/2020 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Motion to Strike

05/05/2020 - Motion to Strike

Motion to Compel

05/05/2020 - Motion to Compel

Supplemental Request to Produce

03/10/2020 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

01/22/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Privilege Log

01/09/2020 - Privilege Log

Notice of Filing:

01/09/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Response to Request for Admissions

01/06/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Answer and Affirmative Defense

12/16/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Request for Admissions

12/11/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

12/11/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

12/11/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

12/11/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Service of Process

10/17/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Pre Trial Summons

10/09/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

09/18/2019 - Statement of Claim

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Leave; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO FILE REPLY TO DEFENDANT S AFFIRMATIVE DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event; Comments: BETTER RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Request to Produce; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event; Comments: JOINT MTN TO WAIVE ATTEDANCE AT THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2140062AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/11/2019 REGISTER#:214CASHIER:GVIVIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive American Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3520032AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:ROSS, BRION M. 1 E BROWARD BLVD STE 700 FT LAUDERDALE FL 33301 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $3113.44

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.