This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/26/2020 at 14:45:58 (UTC).

ATLANTIC MEDICAL SPECIALTY, INC. VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 ATLANTIC MEDICAL SPECIALTY, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATLANTIC MEDICAL SPECIALTY, INC.

Assignor

VAZQUEZ, ENID

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignor Attorneys

Jeffrey G. Hess

John C Llarena

Defendant Attorneys

Remy, Jason

Remy, Jason, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing-

05/14/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion in Limine

05/12/2020 - Motion in Limine

Notice of Filing:

05/12/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

04/21/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

04/17/2020 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request for Production

04/13/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Admissions

04/13/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Production

04/13/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Motion for Extension of Time

03/19/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Filing:

03/18/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Request for Admissions

03/18/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

03/18/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

03/13/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Service of Process

03/10/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Statement of Claim

02/13/2020 - Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

02/13/2020 - Statement of Claim

Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet

02/13/2020 - Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE ALLEGED IN PARAGRAPH 18 OF DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: JULY 21, 2020 AT 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion in Limine; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion in Limine; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2170002AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/27/2020 REGISTER#:217CASHIER:P27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440044AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:JOHN C LLARENA 5975 SUNSET DR STE 601 SOUTH MIAMI FL 33143-5174 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.