This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/13/2021 at 07:37:50 (UTC).

ATLANTIC I AT THE POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSN INC VS OHANA, MORDECHAI

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 ATLANTIC I AT THE POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSN INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against OHANA, MORDECHAI. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATLANTIC I AT THE POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSN INC

Defendants

OHANA, ANETTE

OHANA, MORDECHAI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Esteras, Awilda

Defendant Attorney

Zilberman, Yanina

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/05/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Summons Returned - No Service

09/15/2020 - Summons Returned - No Service

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/29/2020 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Motion for Extension of Time

09/24/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/26/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/05/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/29/2020 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/05/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Complaint

06/26/2020 - Complaint

Voluntary Dismissal

07/12/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

07/12/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Hearing-

05/05/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney's Fees

05/04/2021 - Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney's Fees

Affidavit of Indebtedness

05/04/2021 - Affidavit of Indebtedness

Affidavit as to Attorney Fees

05/04/2021 - Affidavit as to Attorney Fees

Affidavit as to Costs

05/04/2021 - Affidavit as to Costs

Motion for Summary Judgment

05/04/2021 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Answer and Affirmative Defense

12/31/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32622:1861; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITHOUT PREJUDICE Parties: OHANA MORDECHAI; OHANA ANETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 07/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney's Fees; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Indebtedness; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Attorney Fees; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Zilberman Yanina; OHANA MORDECHAI; OHANA ANETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT-AGREED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: OHANA ANETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2600022AMT PAID:$30.00NAME:ESTERAS, AWILDA201 ALHAMBRA CIRCLE, ELEVENTH FLOORCORAL GABLES FL 33134COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:07/01/2020REGISTER#:260CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2560011AMT PAID:$410.00NAME:ESTERAS, AWILDA201 ALHAMBRA CIRCLE, ELEVENTH FLOORCORAL GABLES FL 33134COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$401.00$401.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$410.00RECEIPT DATE:06/30/2020REGISTER#:256CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 31991:51; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATLANTIC II AT THE POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION I is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Esteras, Awilda