This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/26/2022 at 15:03:12 (UTC).

ASSOCIATESMD MEDICAL GROUP VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 ASSOCIATESMD MEDICAL GROUP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASSOCIATESMD MEDICAL GROUP

Assignor

Hadley, Crystal

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Greene, Travis

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/06/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

04/06/2022 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/15/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/20/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Appearance

05/10/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

05/17/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080041AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GREENE, TRAVIS300 SE 17TH STFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33316-2550COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/20/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100166AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:GREENE, TRAVIS300 SE 17TH STFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33316-2550COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:04/08/2022REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AssociatesMD Medical Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greene, Travis