Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/04/2020 at 14:03:11 (UTC).

ASSOCIATES IN FAMILY PRACTICE OF BROWARD, LLC. VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 ASSOCIATES IN FAMILY PRACTICE OF BROWARD, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Associates in Family Practice of Broward, LLC.

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Assignee

Tony, Gladys

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Patino Law Firm

Defendant Attorneys

Barrangan, Arlene

Gaspari, Albert J., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Interrogatory

08/23/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Motion for Sanctions

08/23/2019 - Motion for Sanctions

Motion:

08/23/2019 - Motion:

Notice of Interrogatory

07/19/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Response:

06/10/2019 - Response:

Answer

05/29/2019 - Answer

Order:

04/30/2019 - Order:

Memorandum of Disposition

04/30/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Request for Production

04/29/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Production

08/23/2019 - Request for Production

Motion for Sanctions

08/23/2019 - Motion for Sanctions

Motion:

08/23/2019 - Motion:

Request for Production

07/19/2019 - Request for Production

Response to Request for Production

06/20/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Trial (case at Issue)

06/04/2019 - Notice of Trial (case at Issue)

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

04/30/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Interrogatory

04/29/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Pre Trial Summons

04/16/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Sanctions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Sanctions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DEEM OBJECTIONS WAIVED REGARDING FAILURE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Event Type: Event; Comments: MOTION TO DEEM OBJECTIONS WAIVED REGARDING FAILURE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DEEM OBJECTIONS WAIVED REGARDING FAILURE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DEEM OBJECTIONS WAIVED REGARDING FAILURE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3260040AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/18/2019 REGISTER#:326

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3260031AMT PAID:($10.00) NAME:JOVANOVICH, ZORAN DAVID ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. 700 WEST HILLSBORO BLVD DEERFIELD BEACH FL 33441-1612 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1 ($10.00) ($10.00) TENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3260023AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:JOVANOVICH, ZORAN DAVID ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. 700 WEST HILLSBORO BLVD DEERFIELD BEACH FL 33441-1612 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketSP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3450018AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/22/2019 REGISTER#:345

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Associates in Family Practice of Broward LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant