This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/08/2020 at 10:30:42 (UTC).

ASISA HEALTH SERVICE CORP. VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 ASISA HEALTH SERVICE CORP filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Asisa Health Service Corp.

Assignor

Jorge Carbonell

Defendant

United Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul K Schrier

Defendant Attorney

Harris, Andrea L

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Admissions

03/26/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Answer and Affirmative Defense

03/26/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Motion for Extension of Time

03/25/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Demand for Jury Trial

03/12/2020 - Demand for Jury Trial

Request for Production

02/13/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

02/13/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

02/13/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Complaint

02/13/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: United Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2890011AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/10/2020 REGISTER#:289CASHIER:P27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: United Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3550018AMT PAID:$400.00 NAME:PAUL K SCHRIER 11098 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 208 MIAMI FL 33161-7486 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: 30,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.