This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/24/2023 at 14:12:17 (UTC).

ARTANG REHABILITATION CENTER LLC VS THE RESPONSIVE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 ARTANG REHABILITATION CENTER LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THE RESPONSIVE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-20

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Artang Rehabilitation Center Llc

Assignor

Arguelles, Ismar Martinez

Defendant

The Responsive Auto Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Estevez, Marisol

Defendant Attorney

Mahadai, Jennifer, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/29/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Privilege Log

04/27/2023 - Privilege Log

Response to Request for Production

04/27/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Admissions

02/27/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Answer and Affirmative Defense

02/27/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Motion for Extension of Time

02/15/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

02/15/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

02/15/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

02/15/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service of Process

01/26/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/23/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/16/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Appearance

01/11/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Admissions

01/11/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

01/11/2023 - Request for Production

Statement of Claim

01/11/2023 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/11/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: The Responsive Auto Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140119AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/24/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060023AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:01/12/2023REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less