This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/20/2022 at 06:04:53 (UTC).

ARTANG REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC. VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 ARTANG REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Artang Rehabilitation Center, Llc.

Defendant

Progressive American Insurance Company

Assignee

Lopez, Ariana

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pacin, Marc David

Defendant Attorneys

Diaz de Arce, Alexandra

Barber, Cecilia Maria, ESQ

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/26/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Request for Production

04/22/2022 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

04/22/2022 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

04/22/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Statement of Claim

04/22/2022 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/25/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/22/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Notice of Service of Process

04/29/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Voluntary Dismissal

08/23/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

08/19/2022 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Motion to Strike

08/19/2022 - Motion to Strike

Notice of Filing:

08/11/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

07/13/2022 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

07/13/2022 - Response to Request for Production

Privilege Log

07/13/2022 - Privilege Log

Motion for Extension of Time

06/13/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Response to Request for Admissions

05/23/2022 - Response to Request for Admissions

Objection:

05/19/2022 - Objection:

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33351:3022; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Progressive American Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130266AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:PACIN, MARC DAVIDPACIN LEVINE, P.A. 1150 NW 72 AVE, STE 600MIAMI FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/26/2022REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080185AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:PACIN, MARC DAVIDPACIN LEVINE, P.A. 1150 NW 72 AVE, STE 600MIAMI FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:04/23/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less