Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/26/2021 at 05:29:28 (UTC).

ARMANDO COBO VS STATE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/15/2021 ARMANDO COBO filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cobo, Armando

Defendant

State National Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Maria E Corredor (esq)

 

Court Documents

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/22/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Request for Admissions

02/15/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

02/15/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

02/15/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Complaint

02/15/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/15/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2610256AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:MARIA E CORREDOR (ESQ) CORREDOR, HUSSEINI & SNEDAKER, P.A. 3905 NW 107 AV DORAL FL 33178 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/23/2021 REGISTER#:261CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570046AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:MARIA E CORREDOR (ESQ) CORREDOR, HUSSEINI & SNEDAKER, P.A. 3905 NW 107 AV DORAL FL 33178 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/18/2021 REGISTER#:257CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maria E Corredor (esq)