This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 12/25/2022 at 07:47:09 (UTC).

ARCPE I LLC VS MARIA G. BENDEZU ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 ARCPE I LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARIA G BENDEZU. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARCPE I LLC

Defendants

MARIA G. BENDEZU

EDDY GARCIA

VISTA DEL LAGO I CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC

ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC

CACH, LLC

STATE FARM BANK

JUDGMENT COLLECTIONS OF FLORIDA, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gary I Gassel

 

Court Documents

Service Returned

12/19/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

12/07/2022 - Service Returned

Summons Returned - No Service

12/07/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Returned

12/01/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

12/01/2022 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 15. Parties: CACH LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 16. Parties: STATE FARM BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33474:1362; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event; Comments: RELATED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLEADINGS@GASSELLAW.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARCPE I LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Vista del Lago I Condominium Association is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Asset Acceptance LLC is a litigant