Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/22/2021 at 18:53:02 (UTC).

ARBOR COURTS ASSOCIATION, INC. VS ZELEDON, CLAUDIA

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 ARBOR COURTS ASSOCIATION, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ZELEDON, CLAUDIA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arbor Courts Association, Inc.

Defendants

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee

Zeledon, Claudia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles F Otto Esq

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/12/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/12/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/12/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/12/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

04/12/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

04/12/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

04/09/2021 - Lis Pendens

Email Notice:

04/09/2021 - Email Notice:

Complaint

04/09/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/09/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Lis Pendens

04/09/2021 - Lis Pendens

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580165AMT PAID:$30.00 NAME:CHARLES F OTTO ESQ 2699 STIRLING RD STE C-207 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33312-6517 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/13/2021 REGISTER#:258CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Zeledon Claudia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2610171AMT PAID:$406.00 NAME:CHARLES F OTTO ESQ 2699 STIRLING RD STE C-207 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33312-6517 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$401.00$401.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$406.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/10/2021 REGISTER#:261CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32454:3786; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRIMARY: ATTORNEY@STRALEYOTTO.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arbor Courts Association, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Otto, Charles F, ESQ.