This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/27/2021 at 21:19:44 (UTC).

ARAYS CASTELLON VS BURLINGTON STORES, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 ARAYS CASTELLON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BURLINGTON STORES, INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Castellon, Arays

Defendants

Burlington Stores, Inc.

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Perez, Juan J.

Defendant Attorney

Michael Alexander Garcia

 

Court Documents

Motion to Dismiss

07/08/2021 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Unavailability/absence

07/07/2021 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice of Appearance

07/02/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Admissions

07/02/2021 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

07/02/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

07/02/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Production

07/02/2021 - Request for Production

Service Returned

06/23/2021 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/17/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/09/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Amended Complaint

06/09/2021 - Amended Complaint

Complaint

06/02/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/02/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2640126AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:PEREZ, JUAN J. 1414 NW 107TH AVE STE 302 DORAL FL 33172 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/15/2021 REGISTER#:264CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2640025AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:PEREZ, JUAN J. 1414 NW 107TH AVE STE 302 DORAL FL 33172 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/04/2021 REGISTER#:264CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURLINGTON STORES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Garcia, Michael Alexander, ESQ.