This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/07/2023 at 01:50:35 (UTC).

AQUA DOCS WATER RESTORATION, INC. VS CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 AQUA DOCS WATER RESTORATION, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-21

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AQUA DOCS WATER RESTORATION, INC.

Assignor

Washington, Pearlene

Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Low, David

Canaura, Jose M

Defendant Attorney

Nancy I Stein Mc Carthy (esq)

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unavailability/absence

02/03/2023 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice of Appearance

12/22/2022 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/14/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Request for Production

11/04/2022 - Request for Production

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/04/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Notice of Appearance

01/06/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Hearing-

03/20/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/18/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Motion to Dismiss

01/03/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH FLA. STAT. 627.7152(2)(A)(4)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33737:2496; Event Type: Event; Comments: FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH FLA. STAT. 627.7152(2)(A)(4)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS ||MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Motion; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120064AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:LOW, DAVID2101 WEST COMMERICAL BLVD STE#2800FT LAUDERDALE FL 33309COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/01/2022REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3170063AMT PAID:$400.00NAME:LOW, DAVID2101 WEST COMMERICAL BLVD STE#2800FT LAUDERDALE FL 33309COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$400.00RECEIPT DATE:11/17/2022REGISTER#:317CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $30,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event; Comments: $1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less