This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/21/2023 at 05:32:30 (UTC).

ANTHONY CHARLTON VS BURGER KING CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 ANTHONY CHARLTON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BURGER KING CORPORATION. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charlton, Anthony

Defendant

Burger King Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Philip A Gold

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/12/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/12/2023 - Complaint

Request for Production

01/12/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Production

01/12/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

01/12/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

01/12/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/13/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/18/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Affidavit of Service

01/24/2023 - Affidavit of Service

Notice of Appearance

02/01/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

02/09/2023 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Request for Production

02/09/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

02/09/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150023AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:PHILIP A GOLD9155 S DADELAND BLVDMIAMI FL 33156-2737COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/19/2023REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: Burger King Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060177AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:PHILIP A GOLD9155 S DADELAND BLVDMIAMI FL 33156-2737COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:01/13/2023REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less