This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 03:18:03 (UTC).

ANNELIESE DIAZ VS PRIMARY RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 ANNELIESE DIAZ filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against PRIMARY RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diaz, Anneliese

Defendant

Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Feiler, Michael B.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover

12/18/2019 - Civil Cover

Complaint

12/18/2019 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/23/2019 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/27/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

01/28/2020 - Notice of Removal to Federal Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Book/Page: 31797:3329; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Primary Residential Mortgage Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3310245AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:FEILER, MICHAEL B. 901 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 300 CORAL GABLES FL 33134-3065 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510222AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:FEILER, MICHAEL B. 901 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 300 CORAL GABLES FL 33134-3065 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIMARY RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Feiler, Michael B.