This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/18/2023 at 04:42:34 (UTC).

ANITA NAJIY VS URBAN RENAISSANCE, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/17/2022 ANITA NAJIY filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against URBAN RENAISSANCE, LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Najiy, Anita

Defendants

Urban Renaissance, LLC

KLM of South Florida, Inc.

IBS Construction Group, LLC

High Point Roofing Corp

3Rd Party Defendants

KLM of South Florida Inc

Zelaya Stucco Design Inc

3Rd Party Plaintiff

Urban Renaissance LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Naghshineh, Lana M.

Defendant Attorneys

Paskert, Jeffrey Michael

David Allan Freedman

Baldor, Jose

Peterson, Michael P.

 

Court Documents

Order Setting CM Deadline

02/23/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Order Setting CM Deadline

02/23/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/22/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/22/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/17/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/22/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice:

02/22/2022 - Notice:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/24/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice of Unavailability/absence

02/23/2022 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice of Hearing-

09/08/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion:

09/07/2023 - Motion:

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/31/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/31/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/31/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

08/28/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

08/28/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

08/28/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Third Party Complaint

08/25/2023 - Third Party Complaint

118 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: CALENDAR CALL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT KLM OF SOUTH FLORIDA, INC.'S MOTION FOR STAY AND TO RESET TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: OCTOBER 30, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT KLM OF SOUTH FLORIDA, INC. MOTION FOR STAY AND TO RESET TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3230004AMT PAID:$30.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:09/01/2023REGISTER#:323CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 135. Parties: High Point Roofing Corp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
153 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event; Comments: MOTIONS & MEMO REQUIREMENTS & MANDATORY ORDER TO CONFER ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event; Comments: REQUIRING COMPLIANCE WITH COMPLEX BUSINESS LITIGATION SECTION PROCEDURES ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF INTENT TO BEGIN DEMOLITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3000113AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:NAGHSHINEH, LANA M.340 12TH AVENUE SNAPLES FL 34102COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:02/19/2022REGISTER#:300CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less