This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/03/2022 at 09:08:17 (UTC).

ANDRADE YURRITA, DIEGO VS PEREZ CRESPO, JOAILINE MICHELLE

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 ANDRADE YURRITA, DIEGO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PEREZ CRESPO, JOAILINE MICHELLE. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANDRADE YURRITA, DIEGO

Respondent

PEREZ CRESPO, JOAILINE MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Funes, Alejandro D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: CHC Courtroom 22-A 175 N.W. 1st Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: UCD HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: EFinal Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: 1-11-22 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2950033AMT PAID:$409.00NAME:FUNES, ALEJANDRO D.THE FUNES LAW FIRM PA 2857 SW 27TH AVENUECOCONUT GROVE FL 33133COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$409.00RECEIPT DATE:12/28/2021REGISTER#:295CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Application/ Aff for Determination of Civil Indigent Status; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Copy of:; Event Type: Event; Comments: [DESCRIPTION]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Waiver; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Funes, Alejandro D.