This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/21/2021 at 14:36:41 (UTC).

ANASTASIA MARIN VS NATIONWIDE HVAC CORP ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 ANASTASIA MARIN filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against NATIONWIDE HVAC CORP. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marin, Anastasia

Defendants

Nationwide Hvac Corp

Gritsenko, Arsen

Kozowy, Lukasz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony M Georges-Pierre

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/27/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/27/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/27/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/21/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/21/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/21/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

07/20/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/20/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Kozowy Lukasz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Gritsenko Arsen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Kozowy Lukasz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2940109AMT PAID:$30.00 NAME:ANTHONY M GEORGES-PIERRE 44 W FLAGLER ST STE 2200 MIAMI FL 33130-6807 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/27/2021 REGISTER#:294CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3010013AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:ANTHONY M GEORGES-PIERRE 44 W FLAGLER ST STE 2200 MIAMI FL 33130-6807 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/22/2021 REGISTER#:301CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTHONY M GEORGES-PIERRE, ESQ