This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/14/2023 at 08:55:33 (UTC).

AMERICAN SPINE & ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE, LLC VS ARTISAN AND TRUCKERS CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/08/2022 AMERICAN SPINE ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARTISAN AND TRUCKERS CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Spine & Orthopaedic Institute, LLC

Assignor

Howard, Scott

Defendant

ARTISAN AND TRUCKERS CASUALTY COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/08/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

11/08/2022 - Statement of Claim

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

11/14/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/21/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/28/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: ARTISAN AND TRUCKERS CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020063AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GREENE, TRAVIS300 SE 17TH STFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33316-2550COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/28/2022REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3270021AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:GREENE, TRAVIS300 SE 17TH STFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33316-2550COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:11/15/2022REGISTER#:327CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less