This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/14/2023 at 16:52:39 (UTC).

AMERICAN MED-CARE CENTERS, P.A. VS CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/26/2022 AMERICAN MED-CARE CENTERS, P A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Med-Care Centers, P.A.

Assignor

Koons, Maura

Defendant

Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C Daly

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/26/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

10/26/2022 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/28/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

10/31/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

11/16/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Request for Production

11/16/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

11/16/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

11/16/2022 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing:

11/16/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing Deposition

11/16/2022 - Notice of Filing Deposition

Voluntary Dismissal

01/04/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33532:281; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3170103AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:10/29/2022REGISTER#:317CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050273AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:10/28/2022REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where American Med-Care Centers PA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daly, John C, Jr.