This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/12/2023 at 13:59:35 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATL BANK VS EDOUARD CAMPOS

Case Summary

On 10/31/2022 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDOUARD CAMPOS. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

American Express Natl Bank

American Express Centurion Bank

Defendant

Campos, Edouard

Miami, FL 33132

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott E Modlin

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/31/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

10/31/2022 - Complaint

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

10/31/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/03/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/17/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Campos Edouard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080476AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:SCOTT E MODLIN1551 SAWGRASS CORPORATE PKWY STE 110SUNRISE FL 33323-2832COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:11/04/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120368AMT PAID:$400.00NAME:SCOTT E MODLIN1551 SAWGRASS CORPORATE PKWY STE 110SUNRISE FL 33323-2832COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$400.00RECEIPT DATE:11/01/2022REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $21315.84

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Modlin, Scott Eric