This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/12/2022 at 23:52:53 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS MILAN KRISTOFF

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MILAN KRISTOFF. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

American Express Bank FSB

Defendant

KRISTOFF, MILAN

Miami, FL 33133-4607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott E Modlin

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/27/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

12/27/2021 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/07/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/07/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

03/22/2022 - Service Returned

Affidavit of Indebtedness

05/02/2022 - Affidavit of Indebtedness

Motion for Default

05/04/2022 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

05/04/2022 - Non-Military Affidavit

Default

05/05/2022 - Default

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: KRISTOFF MILAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Indebtedness; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2940088AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:SCOTT E MODLIN1551 SAWGRASS CORPORATE PKWY STE 110SUNRISE FL 33323-2832COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/08/2022REGISTER#:294CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: KRISTOFF MILAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2910176AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:SCOTT E MODLIN1551 SAWGRASS CORPORATE PKWY STE 110SUNRISE FL 33323-2832COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:12/28/2021REGISTER#:291CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Modlin, Scott Eric