This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/13/2020 at 21:44:04 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS LORENA CHAVEZ

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LORENA CHAVEZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-21

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

CHAVEZ, LORENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DiSalle, Lisa

 

Court Documents

Answer

12/19/2019 - Answer

Service Returned

12/04/2019 - Service Returned

Complaint

11/18/2019 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: CHAVEZ LORENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2040064AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/22/2019 REGISTER#:204CASHIER:ANDYM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: CHAVEZ LORENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3670007AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:DISALLE, LISA 216 SEAMIST CT PONTE VEDRA BEACH FL 32082-403 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $10,316.49

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.