This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/08/2019 at 06:17:19 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS JORGE DELTORO

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JORGE DELTORO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

Defendant

DELTORO, JORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sarah C Daley

 

Court Documents

Service Returned

10/03/2019 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/24/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

09/18/2019 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/19/2019 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: DELTORO JORGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510081AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:SARAH C DALEY 5801 ULMERTON RD STE 201 CLEARWATER FL 33760-3951 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3490221AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:SARAH C DALEY 5801 ULMERTON RD STE 201 CLEARWATER FL 33760-3951 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.